This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:06:39 (UTC).

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC. VS WHALER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WHALER, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9350

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC.

Defendants

WHALER LLC

DOBSON MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAORMINA COSMO ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

NEWHOUSE MICHAEL RAYNSFORD

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/8/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/8/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

2/27/2023: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Whaler, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dobson (Defendant); As to: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Whaler, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Whaler, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dobson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Whaler, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dobson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Whaler, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dobson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less