This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2023 at 08:07:59 (UTC).

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC. VS THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0130

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. DBA WEST CENTRAL FOODSERVICE

Defendants

THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT LLC

TRAN PHUONG

 

Court Documents

Other Plaintiffs or Defendants - Other Plaintiffs or Defendants

1/31/2023: Other Plaintiffs or Defendants - Other Plaintiffs or Defendants

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/31/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

1/31/2023: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/31/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/31/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2023

3/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2023

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by West Central Produce, Inc. on 01/31/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC and Phuong Tran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/20/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Phuong Tran (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/07/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/07/2023; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC (Defendant); Phuong Tran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFictitious Business Name (Small Claims); Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC (Defendant); Phuong Tran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOther Plaintiffs or Defendants; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: THE PROSCIUTTO PROJECT, LLC (Defendant); Phuong Tran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less