This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 12:21:52 (UTC).

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., A CORPORATION VS NILKANTH YOGURT INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NILKANTH YOGURT INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8870

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

PATEL AN INDIVIDUAL BHARATKUMAR M

NILKANTH YOGURT INC. A CORPORATION DBA MIDICI NEAPOLITAN PIZZA AKA MIDICI PIZZA RIVERSIDE

KALSARIA AN INDIVIDUAL JITENDRA J

Not Classified By Court

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN GARY

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRINCE DAVID LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lien - Notice of Lien

7/15/2021: Notice of Lien - Notice of Lien

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/9/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation on 05/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BHARATKUMAR M PATEL, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/18/2021; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JITENDRA J KALSARIA, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/28/2021; Service Cost: 82.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILKANTH YOGURT INC., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/28/2021; Service Cost: 87.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILKANTH YOGURT INC., a corporation (Defendant); JITENDRA J KALSARIA, an individual (Defendant); BHARATKUMAR M PATEL, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILKANTH YOGURT INC., a corporation (Defendant); JITENDRA J KALSARIA, an individual (Defendant); BHARATKUMAR M PATEL, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: West Central Produce, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILKANTH YOGURT INC., a corporation (Defendant); JITENDRA J KALSARIA, an individual (Defendant); BHARATKUMAR M PATEL, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS