This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 16:46:33 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS RAMI K HANNA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMI K HANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1925

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

HANNA RAMI K

San Dimas, CA 91773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/16/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of venue

9/16/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of venue

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/16/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

9/16/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rami K Hanna (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rami K Hanna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rami K Hanna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rami K Hanna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration declaration of venue; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rami K Hanna (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA, TRISTAN P.