This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 12:30:11 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS MATHEW A VILLANUEVA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATHEW A VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6968

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

VILLANUEVA MATHEW A

Castaic, CA 91384

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE HARLAN M.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

12/2/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/2/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/2/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/2/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/23/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MATHEW A VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MATHEW A VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MATHEW A VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MATHEW A VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: MATHEW A VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harlan M Reese