This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 12:26:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS MARLON E TAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARLON E TAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0841

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

TAN MARLON E

Winnetka, CA 91306-2364

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE HARLAN M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Venue

1/13/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Venue

Summons Summons on Complaint

1/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

1/13/2023: Complaint

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/3/2023: Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon E Tan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon E Tan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon E Tan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon E Tan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Marlon E Tan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less