This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 11:12:44 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS FERNANDO ROMERO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERNANDO ROMERO, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0945

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

ROMERO FERNANDO AN INDIVIDUAL

Compton, CA 90222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULHORN ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

1/12/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Re Diligence

2/22/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Re Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2024
  • Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Re Diligence; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fernando Romero, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fernando Romero, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fernando Romero, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less