This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 01:29:12 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS CLAUDIA VERA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAUDIA VERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5736

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

VERA CLAUDIA

Temple City, CA 91780

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVRILESCU CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/6/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

10/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

Complaint - Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/12/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA VERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAVRILESCU CLAUDIA