This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 05:23:20 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS BRADEY T BAUER

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRADEY T BAUER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6092

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

BAUER BRADEY T

Palmdale, CA 93551

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVRILESCU CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

10/7/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BRADEY T BAUER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BRADEY T BAUER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BRADEY T BAUER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BRADEY T BAUER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BRADEY T BAUER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAVRILESCU CLAUDIA