This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 16:13:18 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION VS OOH LA LA CATERING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OOH LA LA CATERING, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0269

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER A CORPORATION DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

OOH LA LA CATERING LLC

MCCRARY KYNDRA AN INDIVIDUAL AKA KYNDRA L. MCCRARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SHERMAN GARY

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/27/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/8/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/10/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Writ - Return - Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES( UNSATISFIED )

7/28/2022: Writ - Return - Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES( UNSATISFIED )

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/15/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/15/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

3/18/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3/26/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/29/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES( UNSATISFIED ): As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES( UNSATISFIED ) ( ); Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2243.87; Interest: 50.56; Costs: 835.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant); Costs: 835.00; Interest: 50.56; Credits: 3000.00; Service Date: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant); Costs: 835.00; Interest: 17.33; Credits: 2000.00; Service Date: 10/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Scott R. Herin; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 4155.73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation DBA Premier Meat Company against Defendant Ooh La La Catering, LLC and Defendant Kyndra McCrary an individual AKA Kyndra L. McCrary on the Complaint filed by Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation on 01/05/2021 for the principal amount of $3,042.29, attorney fees of $272.53, interest of $375.91, and costs of $465.00 for a total of $4,155.73.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 03/18/2021 to 03/18/2021; Filed By: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/18/2021; As To Parties changed from Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant), Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant) to Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant), Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 01/29/2021; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2021; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less