Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:34:36 (UTC).

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS VIRGINIA CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIRGINIA CAMPOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2523

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CAMPOS VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS JASON P.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/30/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/30/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Virginia Campos (Defendant); Service Date: 04/05/2021; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Virginia Campos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Virginia Campos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Virginia Campos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant