This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 22:17:12 (UTC).

WARREN GOBERT VS P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL. INC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 WARREN GOBERT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against P W STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0828

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOBERT WARREN

Defendant

P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL. INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/22/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/22/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/3/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2022, Notice of Entry of Judgment

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2022, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/3/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant P.W. Stephens Environmental. Inc against Plaintiff Warren Gobert on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Warren Gobert on 09/22/2022 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: P.W. Stephens Environmental. Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2022, Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Warren Gobert (Plaintiff); As to: P.W. Stephens Environmental. Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less