This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 15:05:42 (UTC).

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO., VS RYE ELECTRIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RYE ELECTRIC INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7589

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO.

Defendants

RYE ELECTRIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OCOTILLO LA 9001SMB LLC

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK

BUILD GROUP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/9/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/9/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/9/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Commencement of Action

11/16/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Commencement of Action

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

11/16/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens

11/30/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - Summons on First Amended Complaint

12/1/2022: Summons - Summons on First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

12/1/2022: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co., on 12/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co., as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, an Illinois corporation (Defendant); Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Build Group Construction Company, Inc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, an Illinois corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, an Illinois corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension changed from (1st) to (1st) ; As To Parties changed from Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, an Illinois corporation (Defendant) to Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, an Illinois corporation (Defendant), Build Group Construction Company, Inc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 105.52; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Ocotillo LA 9001SMB, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/18/2022; Service Cost: 101.98; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ocotillo LA 9001SMB, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Western Bank (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ocotillo LA 9001SMB, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Western Bank (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Walters Wholesale Electric Co., (Plaintiff); As to: Rye Electric Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ocotillo LA 9001SMB, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Western Bank (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less