This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2022 at 16:28:28 (UTC).

VIVIAN N BROWN VS CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 VIVIAN N BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0539

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN VIVIAN N

Defendants

CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO

KATINSKY ZOHAN

WALKER CHARLOTTE HOA

ESTATE VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/20/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

7/20/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/25/2021

8/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/25/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/25/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/25/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/23/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

9/8/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/15/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/15/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/15/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vivian N Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Estate Villas Homeowners Association (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/16/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Vivian N Brown on 07/20/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Classic Property Management Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Estate Villas Homeowners Association against Plaintiff Vivian N Brown on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Vivian N Brown on 07/20/2021 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): As To Parties: Classic Property Management Co (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Estate Villas Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/15/2021, Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Estate Villas Homeowners Association (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Estate to Estate Villas Homeowners Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10/15/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Vivian N Brown (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vivian N Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Classic Property Management Co (Defendant); Zohan Katinsky (Defendant); Charlotte ( HOA ) Walker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Vivian N Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Classic Property Management Co (Defendant); Zohan Katinsky (Defendant); Charlotte ( HOA ) Walker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant