This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 21:55:36 (UTC).

VICTOR HARO VS LAWRENCE DAVID QUAN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 VICTOR HARO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAWRENCE DAVID QUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7025

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARO VICTOR

Defendant

QUAN LAWRENCE DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/27/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Victor Haro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Victor Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Lawrence David Quan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Victor Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Lawrence David Quan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victor Haro (Plaintiff); As to: Lawrence David Quan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Victor Haro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR