Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 03:49:28 (UTC).

VICKI L. MONTZINGO VS MORE LUCKY CATS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 VICKI L MONTZINGO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MORE LUCKY CATS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1938

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTZINGO VICKI L.

Defendants

MORE LUCKY CATS INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY WESTSIDE

MARINOVA MANUELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILKINSON CLAY R.

STONE ELLIOTT H

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/5/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vicki L. Montzingo (Plaintiff); As to: More Lucky Cats, Inc. (Defendant); Manuela Marinova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vicki L. Montzingo (Plaintiff); As to: More Lucky Cats, Inc. (Defendant); Manuela Marinova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vicki L. Montzingo (Plaintiff); As to: More Lucky Cats, Inc. (Defendant); Manuela Marinova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORE LUCKY CATS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKINSON CLAY R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE ELLIOTT H