This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 06:22:30 (UTC).

VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS BERT MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BERT MUNOZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3057

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

MUNOZ BERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/3/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/3/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/3/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/3/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/3/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2025
  • Hearing05/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BERT MUNOZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BERT MUNOZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VIA VERDE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BERT MUNOZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M