This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 17:52:08 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT, LLC VS VANESSA BARRANCAS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 VEROS CREDIT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA BARRANCAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEROS CREDIT LLC

Defendant

BARRANCAS VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment - Judgment

7/31/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

7/28/2022: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/28/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request (name extension) - Request for Attorney Fees

7/28/2022: Request (name extension) - Request for Attorney Fees

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

7/28/2022: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/28/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/28/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Veros Credit, LLC against Defendant Vanessa Barrancas on the Complaint filed by Veros Credit, LLC on 05/24/2022 for the principal amount of $9,890.29, attorney fees of $683.41, and costs of $293.50 for a total of $10,867.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Vanessa Barrancas; On the Complaint filed by Veros Credit, LLC on 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/20/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Barrancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES