This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 11:17:17 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT, LLC VS BREYON MONIQUE WOMACK

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 VEROS CREDIT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BREYON MONIQUE WOMACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1124

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEROS CREDIT LLC

Defendant

WOMACK BREYON MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Veros Credit, LLC against Defendant Breyon Monique Womack on the Complaint filed by Veros Credit, LLC on 05/19/2022 for damages of $4,680.39, attorney fees of $370.82, and costs of $293.50 for a total of $5,344.71.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 08/04/2022 to 08/04/2022; Filed By: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/04/2022; As To Parties changed from Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant) to Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Breyon Monique Womack; On the Complaint filed by Veros Credit, LLC on 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Proposed - Received by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant); Service Date: 06/02/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non service; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Veros Credit, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Breyon Monique Womack (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES