This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 21:01:42 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS ELVA Y RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELVA Y RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7744

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ ELVA Y AKA ELVA RODRIGUEZ AKA ELVA YADIRA RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elva Y Rodriguez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/20/2021; Service Cost: 100.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elva Y Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elva Y Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Velocity Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elva Y Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R