This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2022 at 03:41:48 (UTC).

VALLEYWIDE ESCROW, INC. VS ELIZABETH KENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 VALLEYWIDE ESCROW, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ELIZABETH KENT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1019

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEYWIDE ESCROW INC.

Defendants

POGHOSYAN ANNA

VIP ON 99 ENTERPRISES

LEE ROSE

KENT ELIZABETH

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS MATTHEW STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/8/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2022

12/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2022

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

12/5/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal and Discharge of Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on Disbursement of Monies Interplead; and O

11/22/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal and Discharge of Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on Disbursement of Monies Interplead; and O

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/17/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/11/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

9/9/2022: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Rose

8/8/2022: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Rose

Application for Publication - Application for Publication

8/9/2022: Application for Publication - Application for Publication

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Elizabeth

8/10/2022: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Elizabeth

Application for Publication - Application for Publication

8/3/2022: Application for Publication - Application for Publication

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. Davis in Support of Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow

7/28/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. Davis in Support of Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow, Inc. for an Order to Continue Trial

7/28/2022: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow, Inc. for an Order to Continue Trial

Order (name extension) - Order Order on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow

7/29/2022: Order (name extension) - Order Order on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff Valleywide Escrow

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Trial)

7/29/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Trial)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

8/1/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on 02/05/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 12/08/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); Anna Poghosyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal and Discharge of Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on Disbursement of Monies Interplead; and Order Finding Anna Poghosyan the Sole Claimant to All Remaining Monies Interplead; Signed and Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Poghosyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal and Discharge of Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on Disbursement of Monies Interplead; and Order Finding Anna Poghosyan the Sole Claimant to All Remaining Monies Interplead: Filed By: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Valleywide Escrow, Inc. on 02/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Valleywide Escrow, Inc., does 1 thru 10, Inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Deposit of Funds the Subject of Complaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Kent (Defendant); Rose Lee (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Errata to Complaint-in-Interpleader; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Kent (Defendant); Rose Lee (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Kent (Defendant); Rose Lee (Defendant); Anna Poghosyan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Kent (Defendant); Rose Lee (Defendant); Anna Poghosyan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Valleywide Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Kent (Defendant); Rose Lee (Defendant); Anna Poghosyan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIP ON 99 ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLEYWIDE ESCROW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS MATTHEW STEPHEN