This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 02:53:57 (UTC).

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION VS FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8151

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CORPORATION DBA WASTE MANAGEMENT

Defendant

FINMARK FLOOR COVERING INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELHOUSE CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

11/3/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

11/1/2021: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

11/1/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/1/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/1/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

11/29/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation DBA WASTE MANAGEMENT against Defendant FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation on the Complaint filed by USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation on 08/02/2021 for the principal amount of $3,909.24, attorney fees of $324.00, interest of $746.49, and costs of $415.71 for a total of $5,395.44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation on 08/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation, does 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation; On the Complaint filed by USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation on 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/24/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FINMARK FLOOR COVERING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melhouse, Christina