This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 09:46:28 (UTC).

U.S. FOODS, A CORPORATION VS VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 U S FOODS, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4147

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. FOODS A CORPORATION

Defendants

VENQUEST BGFW LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA FIRE AND BREW

MADHABHUSHI RANGANATH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARWACKI JR. RAYMOND DANIEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/28/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by U.S. FOODS, a Corporation on 05/28/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by U.S. FOODS, a Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: RANGANATH MADHABHUSHI (Defendant); Service Date: 06/21/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/21/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); RANGANATH MADHABHUSHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); RANGANATH MADHABHUSHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: VENQUEST BGFW, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); RANGANATH MADHABHUSHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAYMOND DANIEL