This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 22:02:29 (UTC).

U.S. FOODS, A CORPORATION VS DAVIN VCULEK

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 U S FOODS, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVIN VCULEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7375

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. FOODS A CORPORATION

Defendant

VCULEK DAVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VORONIN YURI

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/8/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest

12/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2024
  • Hearing10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Accrued Interest; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by U.S. FOODS, a Corporation on 10/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by U.S. FOODS, a Corporation, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Davin Vculek; On the Complaint filed by U.S. FOODS, a Corporation on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant); Service Date: 10/14/2021; Service Cost: 160.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. FOODS, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Davin Vculek (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant