This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 04:19:05 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BANDULA P SILVA

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BANDULA P SILVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1082

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SILVA BANDULA P

La Mirada, CA 90638

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAICHELSON MICHAEL H ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

5/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BANDULA P SILVA (Defendant); Service Date: 05/23/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BANDULA P SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BANDULA P SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: BANDULA P SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAICHELSON MICHAEL HARVEY