This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 11:40:13 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS AXEL ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AXEL ORTEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2597

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

ORTEGA AXEL

Lancaster, CA 93535

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROHAN RALUCA

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/1/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Axel Ortega (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2023; Service Cost: 98.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Axel Ortega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Axel Ortega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Axel Ortega (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less