This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 16:19:20 (UTC).

U.S. BANK N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS VARDGES MARKOSYAN

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 U S BANK N A , A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VARDGES MARKOSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5425

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK N.A. A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

MARKOSYAN VARDGES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUGLIAK BENTZION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2024
  • Hearing07/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Vardges Markosyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Vardges Markosyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Vardges Markosyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUGLIAK BENTZION