This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 09:30:55 (UTC).

UNITED PUMPING SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS KANAAN CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 UNITED PUMPING SERVICE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KANAAN CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED PUMPING SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

KANAAN CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

LANAK FRANCIS JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

2/25/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/4/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/4/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/4/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kanaan Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: United Pumping Service, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: United Pumping Service, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kanaan Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/28/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United Pumping Service, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kanaan Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United Pumping Service, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kanaan Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Pumping Service, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kanaan Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PUMPING SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant