This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2022 at 08:17:12 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS OMAR VELASQUEZ CRUZ

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OMAR VELASQUEZ CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0279

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

VELASQUEZ CRUZ OMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/14/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/14/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/14/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

1/14/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer - PI, PD, WD

2/24/2022: Answer - Answer - PI, PD, WD

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) - Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

3/4/2022: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) - Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2025
  • Hearing01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant); Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 03/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer - PI, PD, WD; Filed by: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/25/2022; Service Cost: 84.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Velasquez Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT