This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2022 at 07:01:26 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS JESSICA NAVARRETE

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESSICA NAVARRETE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3279

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

NAVARRETE JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/12/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/12/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

5/12/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/12/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/12/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/12/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2025
  • Hearing05/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Navarrete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Navarrete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Navarrete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Navarrete (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant