This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 12:57:07 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS GABRIELA SALAZAR

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GABRIELA SALAZAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8222

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

SALAZAR GABRIELA

Monrovia, CA 91016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration re: Venue

12/19/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration re: Venue

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/19/2022: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of non service

2/23/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of non service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of non service; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Salazar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Salazar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Salazar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Salazar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration re: Venue; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriela Salazar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less