This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 13:18:09 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS CATHERINE B ARCOL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CATHERINE B ARCOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5938

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

ARCOL CATHERINE B

Palmdale, CA 93550-2407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/17/2022: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Complaint - Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

11/17/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

12/14/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine B Arcol (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine B Arcol (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine B Arcol (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine B Arcol (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine B Arcol (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AFZALNIA AFSANEH