Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 17:44:40 (UTC).

TYLER DURAND, ET AL. VS RYAN DEVOLL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 TYLER DURAND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RYAN DEVOLL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3558

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOIVIN KATIE

DURAND TYLER

Defendant

DEVOLL RYAN AKA RYAN DEVOLL PHOTOGRAPHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER RICHARD T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

6/9/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/10/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/7/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Tyler Durand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tyler Durand, et al. on 05/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tyler Durand and Katie Boivin as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAddress for RICHARD T. MILLER, Esq. (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 06/09/2021 to 06/09/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Tyler Durand (Plaintiff); Katie Boivin (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan DeVoll (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tyler Durand (Plaintiff); Katie Boivin (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan DeVoll (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tyler Durand (Plaintiff); Katie Boivin (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan DeVoll (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tyler Durand (Plaintiff); Katie Boivin (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan DeVoll (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T