This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 15:10:23 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK, IN SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK VS ROY BARENDSE

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 TRUIST BANK, IN SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROY BARENDSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9952

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK IN SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK DBA LIGHTSTREAM

Defendant

BARENDSE ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

12/14/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

Complaint - Complaint

12/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

2/7/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2023
  • Hearing12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Truist Bank, in Successor by Merger to SunTrust Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service: As To Parties: Roy Barendse (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Truist Bank, in Successor by Merger to SunTrust Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Barendse (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Truist Bank, in Successor by Merger to SunTrust Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Barendse (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Truist Bank, in Successor by Merger to SunTrust Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Barendse (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Truist Bank, in Successor by Merger to SunTrust Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Barendse (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less