This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 02:41:55 (UTC).

TREVON M TERRY VS HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 TREVON M TERRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7846

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY TREVON M

Defendants

HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC.

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/21/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/21/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/21/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/21/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/21/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/5/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari in support f Plantiffs Petition to Compel Arbitration

12/5/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari in support f Plantiffs Petition to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2025
  • Hearing11/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 117.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/09/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/09/2022; Service Cost: 117.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Nima Heydari in support f Plantiffs Petition to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Trevon M Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA