This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 19:09:43 (UTC).

TRACY FONTENETTE ALLEN VS ASHLEY N. FONTENETTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 TRACY FONTENETTE ALLEN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ASHLEY N FONTENETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6872

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN TRACY FONTENETTE

Defendants

FONTENETTE ASHLEY N.

WADE VICKIE

UNION BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BEEBE TOD V

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

10/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/26/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

10/5/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

10/5/2021: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/13/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Amended Complaint (1st)

9/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Amended Complaint (1st)

Amended Complaint - (Amended)

9/24/2021: Amended Complaint - (Amended)

Complaint - Complaint

9/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/22/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/22/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/22/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Tracy Fontenette Allen on 09/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Tracy Fontenette Allen as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant); As to: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant); As to: Ashley N. Fontenette (Defendant); Vickie Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff); Service Date: 09/25/21; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff); As to: Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/27/21; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension changed from (1st) to (1st); As To Parties changed from Vickie Wade (Defendant), Ashley N. Fontenette (Defendant), Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant) to Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant), Vickie Wade (Defendant), Ashley N. Fontenette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tracy Fontenette Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. FKA UNION BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEBE TOD VINCENT ESQ.