This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 04:25:47 (UTC).

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DSTRICT VS LAGUNA TREATMENT HOSPITAL., A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DSTRICT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LAGUNA TREATMENT HOSPITAL , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3446

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DSTRICT

LAGUNA TREATMENT HOSPITAL. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOE JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TRAVIS MICHAEL TERRENCE

PEREZ CARLOS R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

9/19/2022: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/19/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/19/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Related Case

9/19/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Related Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Patient Records and Confidential Communications

9/19/2022: Petition (name extension) - Petition for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Patient Records and Confidential Communications

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Petition

9/22/2022: Summons - Summons on Petition

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/5/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

12/5/2022: Answer - Answer

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order For Continuance of Hearing on Petition

12/28/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order For Continuance of Hearing on Petition

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Petition for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Patient Records and Confidential Communications scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 03/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order For Continuance of Hearing on Petition; Signed and Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order For Continuance of Hearing on Petition: Filed By: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent); Jane Doe (Respondent); As to: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent); Service Date: 09/23/2022; Service Cost: 172.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Patient Records and Confidential Communications scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPetition for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Patient Records and Confidential Communications; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Torrance Unified School Dstrict (Petitioner); As to: Laguna Treatment Hospital., a limited liability company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAGUNA TREATMENT HOSPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEREZ CARLOS R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAVIS MICHAEL TERRENCE