This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 01:27:37 (UTC).

TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE VS STEP AND GO HEALTH, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEP AND GO HEALTH, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0926

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE

Defendant

STEP AND GO HEALTH LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Li Yang

5/2/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Li Yang

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/2/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/2/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/2/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Topocean Consolidation Service (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Topocean Consolidation Service on 05/02/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Topocean Consolidation Service as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Topocean Consolidation Service (Plaintiff); As to: Step and Go Health, LLC a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Li Yang; Filed by: Topocean Consolidation Service (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE INC. is a litigant