This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 02:15:36 (UTC).

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY VS JULIO CESAR DUARTE GUILLEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JULIO CESAR DUARTE GUILLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5994

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DUARTE GUILLEN JULIO CESAR

RAMOS TRUCKING & SONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN SUSAN HOPE

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Topa Insurance Company on 08/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Topa Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Topa Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Duarte Guillen (Defendant); Ramos Trucking & Sons, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Topa Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Duarte Guillen (Defendant); Ramos Trucking & Sons, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Topa Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Julio Cesar Duarte Guillen (Defendant); Ramos Trucking & Sons, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SUSAN HOPE