This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 05:26:47 (UTC).

TIFFANI REIBERT VS CANYON VIEW LIMITED

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 TIFFANI REIBERT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CANYON VIEW LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0162

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REIBERT TIFFANI

Defendant

CANYON VIEW LIMITED

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/9/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021

3/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Proof of Service by Certified Mail

4/19/2021: Other - (name extension) - Other - Proof of Service by Certified Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/30/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/30/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Tiffani Reibert against Defendant Canyon View Limited on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tiffani Reibert on 02/09/2021 for the principal amount of $6,400.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $6,475.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Canyon View Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 04/30/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Other - Proof of Service by Certified Mail: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOther - Proof of Service by Certified Mail; Filed by: Tiffani Reibert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/30/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Tiffani Reibert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tiffani Reibert (Plaintiff); As to: Canyon View Limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON VIEW LIMITED is a litigant