This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 22:49:16 (UTC).

THP PROVIDERS, LLC VS KLN COMFORT CARE HOSPICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 THP PROVIDERS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KLN COMFORT CARE HOSPICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4754

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THP PROVIDERS LLC

Defendant

KLN COMFORT CARE HOSPICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIBA KASEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/19/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/19/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

7/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Kasey Diba (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by THP Providers, LLC on 07/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by THP Providers, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: THP Providers, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KLN Comfort Care Hospice, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THP Providers, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KLN Comfort Care Hospice, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/03/2022; Service Cost: 130.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THP Providers, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KLN Comfort Care Hospice, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THP Providers, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KLN Comfort Care Hospice, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THP Providers, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KLN Comfort Care Hospice, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less