This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 09:05:14 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION VS WAYNE DAY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 THE HERTZ CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAYNE DAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0744

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Defendant

DAY WAYNE AKA WAYNE ALFRED DAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH STEPHEN R.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/10/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/10/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/10/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/28/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION on 01/10/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Day (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Day (Defendant); Service Date: 02/09/2023; Service Cost: 99.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Day (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Day (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE HERTZ CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Day (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less