This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2022 at 16:11:16 (UTC).

THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC VS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0685

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN JONATHON E.

Defendant Attorney

PARKER ALYSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/2/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

2/2/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/2/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/2/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/2/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

3/7/2022: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

General Denial - General Denial

3/2/2022: General Denial - General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2025
  • Hearing02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); Service Date: 02/04/2022; Service Cost: 11.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC DBA LAKEWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER ALYSON