This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 20:34:04 (UTC).

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC., VS KARSCH RESOURCE ONE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES, INC , filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARSCH RESOURCE ONE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2302

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CIT GROUP/COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

KARSCH RESOURCE ONE INC. DBA RESOURCE ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUN ERIC J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/18/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by The Cit Group/Commercial Services, Inc., on 12/13/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by The Cit Group/Commercial Services, Inc., as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Cit Group/Commercial Services, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Karsch Resource One, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Cit Group/Commercial Services, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Karsch Resource One, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Cit Group/Commercial Services, Inc., (Plaintiff); As to: Karsch Resource One, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less