This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 18:27:43 (UTC).

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS MIGUEL ALONSO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIGUEL ALONSO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

ALONSO MIGUEL DBA SUD'S DETAILING CENTER

SONIC AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CORPORATION DBA MERCEDES-BENZ OF CALABASAS

SONIC CALABASAS M INC A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS MERCEDES-BENZ OF CALABASAS

AA AUTOMOTIVE PERSONNEL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAPPER BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

KOLAR ELIZABETH L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/6/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/26/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

9/29/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/28/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/28/2022: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/28/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/7/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation on 05/24/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation as to MIGUEL ALONSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL ALONSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant); As to: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant); As to: MIGUEL ALONSO (Defendant); AA AUTOMOTIVE PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SONIC CALABASAS M, INC, a corporation, doing business as Mercedes-Benz of Calabasas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL ALONSO (Defendant); SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL ALONSO (Defendant); SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL ALONSO (Defendant); SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AA AUTOMOTIVE PERSONNEL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONIC CALABASAS M INC.. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONIC AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant