This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 14:44:43 (UTC).

THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. VS DAGOBERTO LAMADRID, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 THE BEST SERVICE CO , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAGOBERTO LAMADRID,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0808

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC.

Defendants

LAMADRID DAGOBERTO

RODRIGUEZ DAGOBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAPLETON CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/6/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

3/6/2023: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees

3/6/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/6/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/6/2023: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

3/8/2023: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff The Best Service Co., Inc. against Defendant Dagoberto Lamadrid and Defendant Dagoberto Rodriguez on the Complaint filed by The Best Service Co., Inc. on 12/28/2022 for the principal amount of $17,741.00, attorney fees of $922.23, interest of $1,591.20, and costs of $511.50 for a total of $20,765.93.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 03/08/2023 to 03/08/2023 ; Result Date changed from 03/07/2023 to 03/08/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant), Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant) to Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant), Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by The Best Service Co., Inc. on 12/28/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by The Best Service Co., Inc., does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 57.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 84.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Best Service Co., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dagoberto Lamadrid (Defendant); Dagoberto Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less