This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 15:41:15 (UTC).

TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS TOMMY HUI

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against TOMMY HUI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7258

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

HUI TOMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/5/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/5/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/5/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2024
  • Hearing10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TOMMY HUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TOMMY HUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TOMMY HUI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TESORO DEL VALLE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M