This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2023 at 21:05:10 (UTC).

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS R&S STAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R S STAR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5375

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

R&S STAR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AL ITALIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOEL SHERYL D.

Defendant Attorney

HANIGAN TIM RICARDO

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

3/3/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/3/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

6/20/2023: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

6/20/2023: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: R&S STAR, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: R&S STAR, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/22/2023; Service Cost: 143.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: R&S STAR, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: R&S STAR, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: R&S STAR, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less