This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 10:04:46 (UTC).

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS JHK CAPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JHK CAPITAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5374

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

JHK CAPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA TAEKWON92 KOREAN BBQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOEL SHERYL D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/3/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/3/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JHK CAPITAL, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JHK CAPITAL, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JHK CAPITAL, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less