This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 11:58:31 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS PHUOC Q LAM

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHUOC Q LAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5652

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

LAM PHUOC Q

Alhambra, CA 91801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/21/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/21/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2023
  • Hearing07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: PHUOC Q LAM (Defendant); Service Date: 07/29/2022; Service Cost: 86.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: PHUOC Q LAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: PHUOC Q LAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: PHUOC Q LAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siduguen, Christine S.